THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:57:35 AM
Murthy, Deepak
CPSO#:
111672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Pune, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Joseph St
Pembroke ON K8A 8C9
Phone: 6137326662
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada | 111 St. Regis Crest South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
T 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 230
F 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 21 Mar 2024
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEEPAK MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2020 |