THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:13:28 AM
Youssef, Sherif
CPSO#:
111512
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035853
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERIF YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 13 Mar 2017 to 09 Apr 2017
EL - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 07 May 2018 to 03 Jun 2018
EL - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |