THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:54:38 AM
Southcott, Daphne Nina
CPSO#:
110997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 4L6
Phone: 519-685-8640
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAPHNE NINA SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Oct 2016 to 10 Jan 2017
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2018 |