THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:17:25 AM
Pillai, Aiswarya
CPSO#:
108879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Medical College Thiruvananthapuram, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 52538
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Jan 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AISWARYA PILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 18 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 18 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jan 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2022 |