THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:17:57 PM
Komsa, Kendra Rose
CPSO#:
106924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON N2G3H1
Phone: 226-476-0459
Fax: 226-215-3193
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENDRA ROSE KOMSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2019 |