THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:21:12 AM
Lo, Ryan Trevor Tse Kwun
CPSO#:
106683
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 9055768711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN TREVOR TSE KWUN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |