THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:43:31 AM
Rao, Nasa Sanjay Kumar
CPSO#:
106121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: St. John's Medical College, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Outpatient Programme
25 Front Ave W Brockville, ON
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: 613-345-0640
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NASA SANJAY KUMAR RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |