THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:32:29 AM
Surendran, Anasuiya Sherhee
CPSO#:
106053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
277 Welland Avenue Unit 11
St Catharines ON L2R 2P7
Phone: 289-480-0192
Fax: 905-938-5333
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:08 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANASUIYA SHERHEE SURENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURENDRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |