THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:10:18 AM
Millman, Alexandra Leora
CPSO#:
105768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Surgery
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6014 Ext. 2
Fax: 416-323-6198
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:17 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA LEORA MILLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2021 |