THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:14:12 AM
Lau, Sally Chui Mei
CPSO#:
105471
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALLY CHUI MEI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
EL - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2023 |