THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:49:00 AM
Mathur, Shobhit
CPSO#:
104335
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Baroda University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul St
4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-6801
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Providence Health Care,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |