THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:27:10 AM
Beduhn, Marianne Elise
CPSO#:
104325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-773 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0B7
Phone: 7052531313
Fax: 7052538759
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIANNE ELISE BEDUHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDUHN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Dec 2016 to 25 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |