THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:22:51 PM
Lipszyc, Deborah Hannah
CPSO#:
103281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
305-745 Mount Pleasant Rd
Toronto ON M4S 2N4
Phone: (416) 487-2052
Fax: (416) 480-2030
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Mar 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH HANNAH LIPSZYC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSZYC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2018 |