THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:42:57 AM
Bohn, Vanessa
CPSO#:
101303
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 6137377600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:22 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VANESSA BOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
AVP - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2019 |