THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:28:59 AM
Garcia Thibodeau, Claudia
CPSO#:
101166
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Garcia, Claudia (used until: 21 Jun 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
737 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON N1H 3Z2
Phone: 1-844-264-2993
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA GARCIA THIBODEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA THIBODEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2020 |