THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:02:48 PM
Batey, Cristina Ashley
CPSO#:
101090
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Shaver Hospital
541 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:23 May 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRISTINA ASHLEY BATEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jul 2016 to 21 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Apr 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2019 |