THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:05:28 PM
Wang, Xuan
CPSO#:
101060
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
1383 16th avenue
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E2
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: (905) 669-8646
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. XUAN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2016 |