THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:38:18 AM
Poling, Justin Dane
CPSO#:
101027
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win
Health Centre
PO Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Phone: 807-737-3030
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTIN DANE POLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |