THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:10:41 AM
Herranen, Kristie Diane
CPSO#:
100990
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2153 Armstrong St
Sudbury ON P3E 4W2
Phone: 705-419-2612
Fax: 705-419-2614
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTIE DIANE HERRANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRANEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2020 |