THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:56:31 AM
Abitbol, Leah
CPSO#:
100952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1755 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 0A3
Phone: 416-290-0361
Fax: 416-290-5986
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEAH ABITBOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABITBOL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2018 |