THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:18:37 PM
Sarfaraz, Mohammad Omair
CPSO#:
100849
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HepCare Cambridge
201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Phone: (519) 740-8400
Fax: (519) 740-8440
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAIR SARFARAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFARAZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
AVP - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry
McMaster University, 08 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2017 |