THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:43:54 AM
Wadhwa, Sonia
CPSO#:
100453
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Vanier Children's Mental Wellness
871 Trafalgar St
London ON N5Z 1E6
Phone: 519 433 3101
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Jul 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SONIA WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
AVP - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2019 |