THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:08:52 PM
Bejaei, Fatemeh
CPSO#:
100391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, French, Persian, Turkish
Education: Tabriz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103-400 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 0H7
Phone: 905-876-3843
Fax: 905-876-2486
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATEMEH BEJAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEJAEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2016 |