THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:15:40 AM
Pilon-Larose, Karine
CPSO#:
100184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Suite 300, 100 Marie-Curie private
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jul 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARINE PILON-LAROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON-LAROSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |