THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:53:44 PM
Holland, Craig William
CPSO#:
100171
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Nelson Medical Professional Group, 301 Victoria Avenue, Fort Frances, ON P9A 2C1
Date Received: 19 May 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |