THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:53:49 AM
Moore, Amanda Margaret
CPSO#:
100113
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
25 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 15 Apr 2013 to 07 May 2013
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 30 Nov 2015 to 25 Dec 2015
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Dec 2015 |