THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/05/24 12:35:39 PM
Davidson, Joseph Kent
CPSO#:
89999
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: Georgetown University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
438 Iroquois Shore Rd
Suite 101
Oakville ON L6H 1M3
Phone: 905-822-2020
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Illinois
USA - Kentucky
USA - Texas
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2008 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: May 25, 2022
Summary:
On May 25, 2022, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct made a finding that Dr. Davidson was guilty of professional misconduct as a result of action taken by the Medical Board of California against Dr. Davidson on February 24, 2021. The New York State Board found that the conduct upon which the disciplinary action by the California Board was based, if committed in New York, would constitute professional misconduct under the laws of the State of New York for failing to maintain a record for each patient which accurately reflects the evaluation and treatment of the patient. The New York State Board did not impose a penalty on Dr. Davidson. The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated June 8, 2022.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: February 24, 2021
Summary:
On January 25, 2021, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Davidson, made a decision and order effective February 24, 2021:issuing a public reprimand made in connection with Dr. Davidson’s violation of the Medical Practice Act for his failure to perform and/or document an adequate physical examination of a patient;that Dr. Davidson is required to complete Board-approved educational programs or courses aimed at correcting any areas of deficient practice or knowledge, and following the completion of each, the Board may administer an examination to test Dr. Davidson’s knowledge of the course; that Dr. Davidson shall complete a course in medical record keeping approved by the Board; andthat Dr. Davison shall complete a professionalism program (ethics course) that meets the requirements of the California Code of Regulations.The College was notified of this finding by a report dated March 16, 2021.