skip to content

Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour, Shahriar

CPSO#: 80484

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Suite M5-501
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 44410 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahriar Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shahrokhi Ebrahimipour ( CPSO# 80484 )

Business Address:
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: 9055212100

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite D716
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5554

Business Address:
237 Barton St E
Suite 501
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
237 Barton St E
Suite M5-501
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHRIAR SHAHROKHI EBRAHIMIPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHROKHI EBRAHIMIPOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2004 to 25 Apr 2004
EL - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006