skip to content

Thavanathan, Rajiv Stephen

CPSO#: 103462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJIV STEPHEN THAVANATHAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. THAVANATHAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. THAVANATHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. THAVANATHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. THAVANATHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. THAVANATHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. THAVANATHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Feb 2020
Summary:

On February 21, 2020, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario released a written order stating its finding that Dr. 
 Rajiv Stephen Thavanathan (“Dr. Thavanathan”) committed an act of professional 
 misconduct.  
  
 Dr. Thavanathan was first issued a postgraduate certificate of registration in July 2014. 
 During the relevant time, Dr. Thavanathan held a postgraduate certificate of registration 
 and practised in Ottawa, Ontario, where he was a fourth year emergency medicine 
 resident. 
  
 In January 2018, Ms A, a woman in her 20s, was brought by ambulance to an 
 emergency department at an Ottawa hospital. Dr. Thavanathan and Ms A had been 
 social acquaintances before her emergency department attendance. They had engaged 
 in flirtatious electronic communication with each other since about August 2017. 
  
 On the morning when Ms A was present, Dr. Thavanathan began a shift in the 
 emergency department. Dr. Thavanathan encountered Ms A in the emergency 
 department after patient handover. When he saw Ms A, he realized that he knew her. Dr. 
 Thavanathan performed a cardiorespiratory examination on Ms A, and asked for an 
 electrocardiogram which had been performed previously to be repeated. Once there was 
 a plan to admit Ms A, Dr. Thavanathan communicated the plan to her. Ms A was admitted 
 to the hospital from the emergency department the same day, after which Dr. 
 Thavanathan had no other encounter with her in hospital.  Ms A was discharged from 
the hospital a few days later.  
 

About four days after her hospital discharge, Ms A sent Dr. Thavanathan an Instagram 
message asking him out on a date. Dr. Thavanathan accepted. Ms A went to Dr. 
Thavanathan’s home in mid-January 2018. They consumed recreational drugs and 
alcohol at his home, and had sexual intercourse. Later that evening, they went to 
 Montreal in Dr. Thavanathan’s car. They stayed in Montreal for two nights. While in 
 Montreal they went to a bar and nightclub together, consumed recreational drugs and 
 engaged in sexual activities. 

 After their trip to Montreal, Dr. Thavanathan and Ms A met several days later. They had 
 sexual intercourse, after which they continued to have flirtatious conversations via 
 Instagram. Ms A advised Dr. Thavanathan the next week that she no longer wanted to 
 continue their relationship. Dr. Thavanathan respected Ms A’s wishes and had no 
 further contact with her. 
  
 It was disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct on Dr. Thavanathan’s part 
 to engage in the behaviour described above with Ms A shortly after his encounter with 
 her  

 In considering penalty, the Committee noted the following facts. 
                                      1 

Dr. Thavanathan has not practised medicine since July 1, 2018, when his postgraduate 
certificate of registration expired and was not renewed by the Registration Committee in 
view of the unresolved concerns regarding this matter. Dr. Thavanathan has one 
remaining year to complete in his residency program.  
Dr. Thavanathan entered into substance use monitoring in December 2018 because of 
the substance use concerns identified in this case. In December 2019, the monitoring 
body reported Dr. Thavanathan to have complied continuously with his substance use 
monitoring. Dr. Thavanathan was reported not to have missed any urine screen tests, 
and all test results have been negative for substances of abuse. Dr. Thavanathan 
continued to demonstrate insight and a commitment to health and wellbeing. Dr. 
Thavanathan t will be monitored with respect to substance use until December 2020. 

The Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs:  

-Dr. Thavanathan to attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 

-The Registrar to suspend Dr. Thavanathan's certificate of registration for a period of 
three (3) months, commencing from February 22, 2020 at 12:01 a.m. 

-The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
Thavanathan's certificate of registration: 

      -Dr. Thavanathan will participate at his own expense in the PROBE Ethics & 
      Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for 
      Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition 
      or qualification. Dr Thavanathan will complete the PROBE program within nine (9) 
      months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his 
      completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant 
      assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 

- Dr. Thavanathan to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days 
of the date of the Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 21, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.