skip to content

Malette, Paul Maurice Joseph

CPSO#: 54489

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone: (705) 897-1018
Fax: (705) 897-2234 Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL MAURICE JOSEPH MALETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Maletteā€™s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Malette sexually abused Patient A and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A, including by kissing and/or attempting to kiss her, by touching her body, including her genital area, in a manner that was sexual and/or inappropriate, by breaching boundaries, and by making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): November 25 - 29, 2019