skip to content

Jha, Neilank Kumar

CPSO#: 81135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. N. Jha Medical Clinic
Unit 37
7575 HWY 27
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone: 905-851-5539
Fax: 905-264-7909 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Neilank Jha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jha ( CPSO# 81135 )

Business Address:
7575 Highway 27
Suite 37
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone Number: (905) 851-5539

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEILANK KUMAR JHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Jha’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Jha has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion Jan 9 & 24, 2020 Hearing May 26 and June 1, 2020