skip to content

Gill, Kulvinder Kaur

CPSO#: 84436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 416
2250 Boivard Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 452-0015
Fax: (905) 452-1309 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 220
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Canada
Phone: (289) 878-8664
Fax: (905) 452-1309
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kulvinder Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 84436 )

Business Address:
Suite 517
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 452-0015

Business Address:
Suite 220
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (289) 878-8664

Business Address:
Suite 416
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 452-0015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KULVINDER KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 17 Dec 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 3, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

An application for judicial review of the decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee has been commenced in the Divisional Court. This decision has also been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 3, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

An application for judicial review of the decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee has been commenced in the Divisional Court. This decision has also been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 3, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

An application for judicial review of the decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee has been commenced in the Divisional Court.
Download Full Document (PDF)