skip to content

Hasnain, Haider

CPSO#: 64959

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 26 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hasnain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2019
Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jan 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2019
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 26 Aug 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jan 2019
Summary:

On January 17, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Haider Hasnain committed an act 
of professional misconduct: in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and in that he has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS  
 
Dr. Haider Hasnain is a 54-year-old family physician who received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 1992 and his specialist qualification in family 
medicine in 1994. His practice is located in the Windsor-Tecumseh area. Dr. Hasnain's CPSO 
number is 64959. During the relevant period, Dr. Hasnain practised out of the Tecumseh 
Community Care Centre ("the clinic"), providing service as a family physician at the clinic, 
including at the urgent-care clinic located in the same premises. Dr. Hasnain was the lessee for 
the clinic space. 
      
The clinic operated on a shared chart system. All physicians treating a particular patient 
contributed to one global chart at the clinic. At the time, the charts were hand-written. In addition 
to Dr. Hasnain, who owned the clinic, four other physicians, Drs. B (a pediatrician), C, D and D, 
provided medical services to patients on a full-time basis. Two other physicians, Drs. F and G, 
provided medical services on a part-time basis. 
      
Ms. Z is in her 50’s. Between June 2008 and January 2009, Ms. Z was treated at the clinic by 
physicians other than Dr. Hasnain on several occasions for a variety of issues, including asthma, 
anxiety and concerns around a mammogram. The physicians include Drs. G, D, C and F. 
 
On February 6, 2009, Ms. Z sought medical treatment at the clinic. She was initially seen by a 
nurse at the clinic who noted her observations of Ms. Z on the medical chart as follows: "pulse 
60, increased lethargic, weight gain, depression, bp 106/60". Dr. Hasnain was working in the 
urgent care area of the clinic and he provided treatment to Ms. Z. Dr. Hasnain noted in the chart 
that Ms. Z missed her previous menstrual cycle and that she was not sexually active at all. Dr. 
Hasnain requisitioned a blood sample. That same day, a laboratory technician at the clinic drew a 
blood sample from Ms. Z. The test results were faxed back to the clinic later that day. Dr. 
Hasnain submitted a claim to OHIP for an intermediate assessment. Hematology results 
suggested that Ms. Z's iron levels were slightly below normal. A nurse reviewed this information 
with Ms. Z the following day. 
 
On February 10, 2009, Ms. Z was seen again by Dr. Hasnain. Dr. Hasnain noted in the patient 
chart that Ms. Z previously experienced constipation when taking iron pills. Dr. Hasnain 
prescribed six vials of 2 ml iron injections. Dr. Hasnain submitted a claim to OHIP for a minor 
assessment. 
      
On February 19th and February 24th, 2009, a nurse at the clinic administered two iron injections 
to Ms. Z, as previously directed by Dr. Hasnain and as recorded in the patient chart.  
 
Ms. Z received medical treatment from Dr. G and other clinic physicians for various issues 
between February 2009 and May 2009. According to her patient chart, Ms. Z saw Dr. G on three 
occasions between February 2009 and April 2009 for gynecological issues including a pap smear 
and a referral to Dr. J, a specialist gynecologist. During March and April 2009, Ms. Z was treated 
by four other clinic physicians on four occasions for complaints including throat infections. 
 
Sometime in May 2009, Ms. Z and Dr. Hasnain commenced a consensual sexual relationship. 
The relationship spanned from May 2009 to either December 2009 or January 2010 and included 
approximately 8-10 occasions of mutual oral sex and one occasion of sexual intercourse, as well 
as other sexual activity such as mutual sexual touching. All of the sexual interactions occurred in 
one room within the clinic, with the exception of one encounter that occurred elsewhere in the 
clinic. The final sexual encounter was the act of sexual intercourse that took place either in late 
December 2009 or early January 2010. 
 
After the commencement of the sexual relationship with Dr. Hasnain, Ms. Z received treatment 
from G on August 23, 2009, for anxiety. Ms. Z was provided with a prescription for Celexa. Ms. 
Z also saw another clinic physician, Dr. E, on September 10, 2009, December 28, 2009, 
December 31, 2009 and January 8, 2010, regarding asthma and throat symptoms and back pain 
as set out in the patient chart. 
 
Following the commencement of the sexual relationship in May 2009, Dr. Hasnain provided 
treatment to Ms. Z on three occasions in September 2009 and provided a prescription on one 
occasion in August 2009. The treatments provided in September 2009 were provided within the 
urgent care area of the clinic, at times when Dr. Hasnain was the only assigned physician. 
 
On August 6, 2009, Ms. Z filled a prescription for a medication issued by Dr. Hasnain. There are 
no chart or OHIP entries related to this prescription. 
 
On September 1, 2009, Dr. Hasnain provided treatment for Ms. Z, recorded as follows in her 
patient chart: "Bloodwork re alopecia, assessment, alopecia and get blood work results first".  
Ms. Z consented to the release of her most recent bloodwork results, which had been 
requisitioned by Dr. J, referred to in paragraph 13 above. On September 1, 2009, Medical 
Laboratories of Windsor forwarded the lab results, originally requested by Dr. J, to the clinic. 
After reviewing the results some time that night or the next day Dr. Hasnain wrote on the bottom 
of the fax coversheet from Medical Laboratories, "See Dr. G." Dr. Hasnain submitted a claim to 
OHIP for a minor assessment. 
 
On September 3, 2009, Ms. Z advised one of the nurses that she was experiencing "chest pains". 
Dr. Hasnain was the only physician in the clinic at the time. Dr. Hasnain ordered an EKG. The 
results of the EKG revealed no abnormalities. Dr. Hasnain made the following notes on Ms. Z's 
medical chart: "states history of arrhythmia and occurs a bit, and abdominal pain on and off, well 
and dizzy +++, observed no acute distress and assess well and EKG normal" A claim was 
submitted to OHIP by Dr. Hasnain as a minor assessment. 
 
On September 4, 2009, at approximately 11:39 a.m., a nurse wrote "f/u [follow up] re: 
bloodwork" in Ms. Z's chart. Dr. Hasnain's notes in Ms. Z's medical chart states: "well, observed 
not acutely distressed and assess as well and second set of labwork ordered re alopecia and 
anemia". A blood sample was drawn at the clinic on that day. Dr. Hasnain reviewed the results 
that night or the next day and wrote "let her know" on the results to advise the nurses to share the 
iron level results with Ms. Z. Dr. Hasnain submitted a claim to OHIP for a minor assessment. 
      
Ms. Z commenced videotaping her encounters with Dr. Hasnain, including sexual encounters, as 
of June 5, 2009 without his knowledge. Ms. Z videotaped the medical encounters on September 
1, 3 and 4, 2009. The Videos of the appointments demonstrate that the appointments lasted the 
following length of time: appointment of September 1, 2009 - 1 minute and 46 seconds; 
appointment of September 3, 2009 - 1 minute and 10 seconds; appointment of September 4, 2009 
- 2 minutes and 21 seconds. 
 
SEXUAL ABUSE OF A PATIENT 
 
To fall within the meaning of the sexual abuse as defined in the legislation, the Discipline 
Committee must find that the sexual relations occurred between a physician and a patient. As 
noted by the Ontario Court of Appeal in the case of Leering, “The disciplinary offence of sexual 
abuse is defined in the Code for the purpose of these proceedings as the concurrence of a sexual 
relationship and a health care professional-patient relationship. There is no further inquiry once 
those two factual determinations have been made.”  
                
The Committee considered whether Ms. Z was a patient of Dr. Hasnain using the analytical 
approach adopted in the case law prior to legislative amendments coming into effect on May 1, 
2018. This included a consideration of the factors outlined in the previous discipline case of 
Redhead to determine whether Ms Z was a patient of Dr. Hasnain’s in the relevant time period.  
The Committee also considered whether Ms. Z was a patient of Dr. Hasnain by retrospectively 
applying the new definition of patient in the Health Professions Procedural Code (the Code) and 
the criteria in the new Patient Criteria Regulation. The Committee found that regardless of which 
approach is taken, a physician-patient relationship existed between Ms. Z and Dr. Hasnain and 
that it was established on February 6, 2009 and continued until at least September 4, 2009.  
 
The Agreed Statement of Facts confirmed that the sexual relationship between Dr. Hasnain and 
Ms. Z commenced in May 2009 and extended into late December 2009 or early January 2010. 
The Agreed Statement of Facts confirmed that there was an ongoing sexual relationship when 
Dr. Hasnain wrote a prescription for Ms. Z in August 2009 and assessed Ms. Z and provided 
health care services to her on the three occasions in September 2009. The Committee found that 
the physician-patient relationship established in February 2009 continued until at least 
September 4, 2009 and that the sexual relationship between Dr. Hasnain and Ms. Z, which 
spanned the period May 2009 until late December 2009 or January 2010, was concurrent with 
the physician-patient relationship. 
 
Therefore, the Committee found that the allegation of sexual abuse was proven. 
 
DISHONOURABLE, DISGRACEFUL, OR UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Hasnain engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, by engaging in a sexual relationship 
with his patient. 
            
IMMEDIATE INTERIM SUSPENSION 
 
Given the Committee’s findings, the Committee made an immediate interim order suspending 
Dr. Hasnain’s certificate of registration, until such time as the Committee makes its decision on 
penalty.  
 
Penalty hearing to be scheduled.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: July 4, 2018 Penalty hearing: August 26, 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 3, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 3, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)