skip to content

Amer, Emad El-Din

CPSO#: 54933

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 18, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On May 16, 2008 Credit Valley Hospital notified the College that Dr. Emad Amer's privileges at this hospital were suspended, effective April 18, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 May 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 07 Jan 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Oct 2011
Summary:

 On October 26, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Emad ElDin Amer committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

In 2008, Dr. Amer became involved in a 
 confrontation with members of the Credit Valley Hospital's security staff when he was unable to 
 access his belongings from the doctors' lounge. He banged forcefully at the security office door, 
 breaking the security office's door frame. When the door was opened, Dr. Amer entered the office. 
 His actions were captured on a video recording. Staff report that they felt intimidated by Dr. 
 Amer's inappropriate words and actions while in the security office.  

The Discipline Committee 
 ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Amer appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

2.	Dr. Amer 
 pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 60 days of the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 26, 2011

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr, Emad El-Din Amer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 15, 2019:

Dr. Amer was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of of professional misconduct and incompetence. In addition, College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Amer engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his respirology practice, and in his conduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Amer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)