skip to content

Ralph-Edwards, Anthony Charles

CPSO#: 58456

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
4N 449
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4309
Fax: (416) 340-3803 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anthony C. Ralph-Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ralph-Edwards ( CPSO# 58456 )
Dr. R. Ralph-Edwards ( CPSO# 109122)

Business Address:
The Toronto Hospital
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
4N 449
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4309

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHARLES RALPH-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALPH-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988