skip to content

Bagai, Akshay

CPSO#: 79384

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5973
Fax: (416) 864-6021 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 David Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y2P9
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: 905 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 David Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y2P9
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 905 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akshay Bagai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagai ( CPSO# 79384 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Room 7-090
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 917-9497

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AKSHAY BAGAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007