skip to content

James, Adrian Lewis

CPSO#: 75783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Mar 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Mar 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave Rm 6103
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2190
Fax: (416) 813-5036 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Blanche River Health
145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2021
Corporation Name: Dr Adrian James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. James ( CPSO# 75783 )

Business Address:
555 2 University Ave
Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: 4168134938


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:11 Mar 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2022 Active
 1.    Dr. Adrian Lewis James may practise medicine only,

                  (i)  in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Otolaryngology-Head & Neck
                       Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. James holds an academic appointment at the
                       rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment. 

                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire when Dr. James no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.