skip to content

Rabiu, Adegbenga Oluwaseun

CPSO#: 107501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southbank Medical Centre
3 - 2430 Bank St
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone: 6137366946
Fax: 6137366948 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

O'Connor Medical Group
403-367 O'Connor St
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rabiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rabiu ( CPSO# 107501)

Business Address:
Southbank Medical Centre
Unit 1
2046 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (289) 501-2016

Business Address:
Green Street Medical Centre
16 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3R2
Phone Number: (289) 501-2046

Business Address:
O'Connor Medical Group
Suite 403
367 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2020

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Rabiu’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Rabiu engaged sexual abuse of a patient and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards the patient, including by inappropriate and/or sexual touching of the patient’s body, including her breasts, and by lifting or displacing her clothing without consent. It is also alleged that Dr. Rabiu contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in treating a patient, an adult, while the terms of his certificate of registration permitted him to practise paediatrics only.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): December 16-18, 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019 Active
             (1 of 2)
            As from 12:01 a.m., January 17, 2019, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports  Committee  of  the  College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and  limitations  are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Adegbenga Oluwaseun Rabiu:

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (i)   Dr. Rabiu shall post a sign in each waiting  room,  examination  room and
                  consulting room at any location where he practises medicine, in a clearly
                  visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix  "B"
                  that  states:  "Dr.  Rabiu  is only permitted to practise pediatrics. Dr.
                  Rabiu is not permitted to treat  adults  at  all, including by physically
                  examining them, prescribing to them, or offering  medical advice to them.
                  Further  information  may  be  found  on  the College of  Physicians  and
                  Surgeons of Ontario's website at www.cpso.on.ca;" 

            (ii)  Dr. Rabiu shall post a certified translation(s)  in  any  language(s)  in
                  which  he  provides services, of the sign described in (i) above, in each
                  waiting room,  examination room and consulting room at any location where
                  he practises medicine,  in  a clearly visible and secure location, in the
                  form attached hereto as Appendix "B;"

            (iii) Dr. Rabiu shall provide any certified  translation(s)  required  by  (ii)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Monitoring

            (iv)  Dr.  Rabiu  shall  consent to the College making enquiries of the Ontario
                  Health Insurance Plan  and/or  any  person  or  institution  who may have
                  relevant  information  in  order  for  the College to monitor Dr. Rabiu's
                  compliance  with  the  terms  of  this Order  and/or  the  terms  of  his
                  certificate of registration and shall  promptly sign such consents as may
                  be necessary for the College to obtain relevant  information  from  these
                  persons or institutions;

            (v)   Dr.   Rabiu   shall  submit  to,  and  not  interfere  with,  unannounced
                  inspections of  his  practice locations and to inspections of appointment
                  logs and patient charts  by  the  College  and  to any other activity the
                  College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Rabiu's  compliance  with
                  the terms of this Order;

            (vi)  Dr.  Rabiu  shall  consent  to  the  College  providing  the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,  at  any
                  practice  location  where  he  practises  ("Chief(s)  of  Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College  has that
                  led  to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring  of
                  his compliance with this Order.

            (2 of 2)
            As from October  1, 2018, by order of the Registration Committee of the College
            of Physicians and  Surgeons  of  Ontario,  the  following terms, conditions and
            limitations  are  imposed  on  the  certificate  of registration  held  by  Dr.
            Adegbenga Oluwasenu Rabiu:

            1.    Dr. Adegbenga Oluwaseun Rabiu may practise paediatrics  at  the Southbank
                  Medical Centre and O'Connor Medical Group in Ottawa, Ontario, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires on September  30,
                  2020.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Rabiu's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not  provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Rabiu's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2018,  and  will  expire  on  or
                  before September 30, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.