skip to content

Brown, Alan David

CPSO#: 50206

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 321
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 339-0956
Fax: (905) 339-0452 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 50206 )

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 321
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 339-0956

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983