THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:55:27 PM
Alhrbi, Mashael Mufarrij
CPSO#:
85242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Center
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB R3A 1R9
Phone: 204-787-3837
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MASHAEL MUFARRIJ ALHRBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHRBI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PEAP - R - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Aug 2007 to 02 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |