THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:48:13 PM
Jain, Preeti
CPSO#:
73192
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON M6G 4A1
Phone: (416) 534-1159
Fax: (416) 572-0083
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PREETI JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Jan 1999
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2000 |