THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:49:20 AM
Campbell, Donald Malcolm
CPSO#:
31732
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Donald Malcolm Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto, ON M3M 0B2
Date Received: 12 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |