skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/06/20 2:42:15 AM

Kliman, Lorne David

CPSO#: 31579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORNE DAVID KLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)