THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:06:59 AM
Daya, Salim Haiderali
CPSO#:
31386
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Feb 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Kachchi
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Newlife Fertility Centre
4250 Sherwoodtowne Boulevard
Mississauga ON L4Z 2G6
Phone: (905) 896-7100 Ext. 131
Fax: (905) 896-7200
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 20 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 May 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 14 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Salim Haiderali Daya to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daya engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his infertility practice including his OHIP claims and delegation to non-physicians. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Daya will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
Dr. Daya will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.
Dr. Daya’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)