skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/12/19 13:13:26 PM

Robertson, Susan June

CPSO#: 31308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8309 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baranick-Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baranick ( CPSO# 31037 )
Dr. S. Robertson ( CPSO# 31308 )

Business Address:
Apple Tree Medical Clinic
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone Number: (613) 236-9473

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 25 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN JUNE ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1989