THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:00:05 AM
Marquis, Jean-Francois
CPSO#:
30444
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
18 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jean-Francois Marquis Medicine Societe Professionelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Chief Cardiology
Ottawa Heart Institute
RM 3509
40 Ruskin
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Date Received: 22 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2019 |