THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:23:15 AM
O'Flanagan, Denis John
CPSO#:
30348
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: O'Flanagan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street.
Strathroy. Ontario. N7G 3H4
Date Received: 08 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2022 |