skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/07/20 11:33:19 AM

Conway, Denis Martin George

CPSO#: 30112

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact: Dr. Gordon Liu at: Maple Leaf Medical Clinic, Suite 301, 14 College St., Toronto, ON., M5G 1K2, Tel: 416-465-3252, ext. 2.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020