THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:09:42 AM
Liwanpo, Paul Ting Fen
CPSO#:
29935
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of St. Andrews, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. T. F. Liwanpo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Feb 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 25, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Ting Fen Liwanpo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 25, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Liwanpo engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Liwanpo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)