skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/11/19 14:34:59 PM

Ho, Doris Shi-Chung

CPSO#: 29645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jan 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Doris Shi-Chung Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 19, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Ho’s practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Effective January 15, 2018 Dr. Ho resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.